NY A02432 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.104
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.104
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to instituting internet service neutrality; provides the public service commission with jurisdiction over monitoring broadband internet service providers; requires a certification for internet service neutrality in certain state contracts.
Title
Relates to instituting internet service neutrality; provides the public service commission with jurisdiction over monitoring broadband internet service providers; requires a certification for internet service neutrality in certain state contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.104 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.334 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S03663 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS