NY A02423 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - print number 2423a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - print number 2423a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the New York character development commission and establishes the New York character development fund.
Title
Creates the New York character development commission and establishes the New York character development fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Ron Kim [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Dan Quart [D] |
Asm. Edward Braunstein [D] | Asm. Francisco Moya [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | print number 2423a |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S03149 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - PRINT NUMBER 3149A