NY A02411 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to factors for the issuance of an order of recognizance or bail.
Title
Relates to factors for the issuance of an order of recognizance or bail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-01-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S08688 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - REFERRED TO CODES