NY A02409 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5664b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5664b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of education, in cooperation with the commissioner of agriculture and markets, to establish voluntary guidelines to provide for the donation of excess, unused, edible food from school, university or other educational institutions' meal programs to voluntary food assistance programs.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of education, in cooperation with the commissioner of agriculture and markets, to establish voluntary guidelines to provide for the donation of excess, unused, edible food from school, university or other educational institutions' meal programs to voluntary food assistance programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5664b |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.527 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | print number 2409b |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | print number 2409a |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2017-01-20 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05664 (Same As) 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.316