NY A02401 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Waives the ability of government agencies in New York to claim copyright protection except where the record reflects artistic creation, or scientific or academic research, or if the agency intends to distribute the record or derivative work based on it to the public by sale or other transfer of ownership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Waives the ability of government agencies in New York to claim copyright protection except where the record reflects artistic creation, or scientific or academic research, or if the agency intends to distribute the record or derivative work based on it to the public by sale or other transfer of ownership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2018-03-15Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-15Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.186
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-03-13SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2017-03-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-03-13Assemblypassed assembly
2017-02-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.73
2017-02-14Assemblyreported
2017-01-20Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S01205 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback