NY A02396 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.93
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.93
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires contracts for cable television and broadband internet attachments to utility poles and the use of utility ducts, trenches and conduits to include all such poles, ducts, trenches and conduits located within a given city, town or village pursuant to a negotiated site license; relates to necessary repairs and replacement costs.
Title
Requires contracts for cable television and broadband internet attachments to utility poles and the use of utility ducts, trenches and conduits to include all such poles, ducts, trenches and conduits located within a given city, town or village pursuant to a negotiated site license; relates to necessary repairs and replacement costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Assembly | approval memo.93 |
2021-12-22 | Assembly | signed chap.723 |
2021-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1586 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7028 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.165 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.165 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | print number 2396a |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S07028 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2396A