NY A02394 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.280
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the office of victims services to consult with the office for the aging in establishing a program for home visitation for elderly and invalid victims of violent crime.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the office of victims services to consult with the office for the aging in establishing a program for home visitation for elderly and invalid victims of violent crime.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-12Senatesigned chap.280
2017-08-31Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-13SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-13Senate3RD READING CAL.1551
2017-06-13SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4909
2017-03-02SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
2017-03-02Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-03-02Assemblypassed assembly
2017-02-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.72
2017-02-13Assemblyreported
2017-01-20Assemblyreferred to aging

Same As/Similar To

S04909 (Same As) 2017-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2394

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback