NY A02393 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-7)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts provisions relating to collective negotiations by health care providers with certain health care plans in certain counties; applies to health benefit plans that provide benefits for medical or surgical expenses incurred as a result of a health condition, accident or sickness, including an individual, group, blanket or franchise insurance policy or insurance agreement offered by certain enumerated entities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts provisions relating to collective negotiations by health care providers with certain health care plans in certain counties; applies to health benefit plans that provide benefits for medical or surgical expenses incurred as a result of a health condition, accident or sickness, including an individual, group, blanket or franchise insurance policy or insurance agreement offered by certain enumerated entities.

Sponsors

Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]
Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]
Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Harry Bronson [D]
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]
Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]
Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]
Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Nily Rozic [D]
Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Patrick Burke [D]
Asm. John Salka [R]Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]
Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]
Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R]
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Nicole Malliotakis [R]Asm. David McDonough [R]Asm. Michael Montesano [R]
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]Asm. Edward Ra [R]Asm. Andrew Raia [R]
Asm. Diane Richardson [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S03462 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - REFERRED TO HEALTH

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback