NY A02381 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of health to make grants to not-for-profit organizations and elementary, secondary and postsecondary schools to be used to help pay for the costs of conducting local blood drives.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of health to make grants to not-for-profit organizations and elementary, secondary and postsecondary schools to be used to help pay for the costs of conducting local blood drives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Senate | tabled |
2018-12-07 | Senate | vetoed memo.273 |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1539 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2701 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.183 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.497 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-18 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S02701 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2381