NY A02379 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.182
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.182
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires every general hospital to have a community advisory board.
Title
Requires every general hospital to have a community advisory board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.182 |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.35 |
2017-01-31 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-18 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00576 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH