NY A02375 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - approval memo.57
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - approval memo.57
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that court ordered forensic evaluations involving child custody and visitation be a licensed psychologist, social worker or psychiatrist who has completed a training program developed by the New York State Coalition Against Domestic Violence.
Title
Requires that court ordered forensic evaluations involving child custody and visitation be a licensed psychologist, social worker or psychiatrist who has completed a training program developed by the New York State Coalition Against Domestic Violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Assembly | approval memo.57 |
2022-12-23 | Assembly | signed chap.740 |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1760 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6385B |
2022-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2375c |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.104 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.752 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.752 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 2375b |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | print number 2375a |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06385 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2375C