NY A02370 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - amended on third reading 2370a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - amended on third reading 2370a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain prohibitions in contracts or agreements by health maintenance organizations; prohibits clauses which entitle reimbursement at the lowest price or rate; prohibits contracts which restrict referral of patients based solely upon a health care provider's status with a managed care product; prohibits disclosure of an enrollee's diagnosis on a prescription as a condition for authorizing coverage for payment or dispensing of a prescription; and prohibits contracts which allow for the substitution of a pharmaceutical drug or agent by any person other than the prescribing health care professional.
Title
Relates to certain prohibitions in contracts or agreements by health maintenance organizations; prohibits clauses which entitle reimbursement at the lowest price or rate; prohibits contracts which restrict referral of patients based solely upon a health care provider's status with a managed care product; prohibits disclosure of an enrollee's diagnosis on a prescription as a condition for authorizing coverage for payment or dispensing of a prescription; and prohibits contracts which allow for the substitution of a pharmaceutical drug or agent by any person other than the prescribing health care professional.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2370a |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.180 |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.49 |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-18 | Assembly | referred to health |