NY A02358 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - ordered to third reading rules cal.88
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - ordered to third reading rules cal.88
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting ownership or control of managed long term care plans by health maintenance organizations or insurers.
Title
Relates to prohibiting ownership or control of managed long term care plans by health maintenance organizations or insurers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.88 |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.88 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | print number 2358a |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-18 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01098 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - PRINT NUMBER 1098A