NY A02344 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-21 - approval memo.24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-21 - approval memo.24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires food allergy awareness in food establishments and online food ordering services; establishes penalty not to exceed $125.
Title
Requires food allergy awareness in food establishments and online food ordering services; establishes penalty not to exceed $125.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 115 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 115 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Assembly | approval memo.24 |
2022-11-21 | Assembly | signed chap.623 |
2022-11-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.890 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8102A |
2022-04-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2344a |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.385 |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |