NY A02337 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain contractor, subcontractor and worker certifications for certain contracts which involve industrial painting or industrial coating work.
Title
Requires certain contractor, subcontractor and worker certifications for certain contracts which involve industrial painting or industrial coating work.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | print number 2337a |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03561 (Same As) 2020-02-26 - referred to governmental operations