NY A02335 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the office for diversity and educational equity within the state university of New York administration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the office for diversity and educational equity within the state university of New York administration.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-04Assemblyenacting clause stricken
2012-01-09Assemblyprint number 2335a
2012-01-09Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2012-01-04Assemblyreferred to higher education
2011-01-18Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S00059 (Same As) 2012-01-05 - PRINT NUMBER 59A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback