NY A02333 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - signed chap.450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - signed chap.450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of an accusatory instrument; provides that a parking ticket may be an accusatory instrument if certain criteria are met.
Title
Relates to the definition of an accusatory instrument; provides that a parking ticket may be an accusatory instrument if certain criteria are met.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Senate | signed chap.450 |
2019-10-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.982 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5078 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.184 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S05078 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - signed chap.450