NY A02330 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-4)
Status: Passed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - approval memo.155
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-4)
Status: Passed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - approval memo.155
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the public service commission to study the feasibility and the costs of burying all or most of the electrical, telephone and internet transmission lines in New York state and to publish and deliver a report of its findings to the governor and the legislature, and requires new electrical, telephone and internet transmission lines to be buried underground.
Title
Directs the public service commission to study the feasibility and the costs of burying all or most of the electrical, telephone and internet transmission lines in New York state and to publish and deliver a report of its findings to the governor and the legislature, and requires new electrical, telephone and internet transmission lines to be buried underground.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-29 | Assembly | approval memo.155 |
2021-12-29 | Assembly | signed chap.805 |
2021-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1775 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4186A |
2021-05-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.349 |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-02 | Assembly | print number 2330a |
2021-02-02 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S04186 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2330A