NY A02328 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - print number 2328b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits and regulates the discovery and disclosure of immigration status; prohibits police officers, peace officers, school resource officers, probation agencies, state entities, state employees, and municipal corporations from questioning individuals regarding their citizenship or immigration status; regulates the disclosure of information relating to immigration status.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits and regulates the discovery and disclosure of immigration status; prohibits police officers, peace officers, school resource officers, probation agencies, state entities, state employees, and municipal corporations from questioning individuals regarding their citizenship or immigration status; regulates the disclosure of information relating to immigration status.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-27Assemblyprint number 2328b
2022-05-27Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2022-01-05Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2021-06-01Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-04-28Assemblyprint number 2328a
2021-04-28Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2021-03-09Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2021-01-14Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S03076 (Same As) 2022-05-29 - PRINT NUMBER 3076B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A2328
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02328&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02328
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02328&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02328A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02328&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02328B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02328&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02328&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback