NY A02326 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - ordered to third reading rules cal.516
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - ordered to third reading rules cal.516
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use and sale of tobacco at state-operated institutions of the state university of New York.
Title
Prohibits the use and sale of tobacco at state-operated institutions of the state university of New York.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.516 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.516 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S04322 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION