NY A02325 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the state recognition and acknowledgment of the Montaukett Indians.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the state recognition and acknowledgment of the Montaukett Indians.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-29Senatetabled
2017-11-29Senatevetoed memo.174
2017-11-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-21SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2232
2017-06-15Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-15Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.281
2017-06-14Assemblyrules report cal.281
2017-06-14Assemblyreported
2017-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-01-18Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S03006 (Same As) 2017-05-16 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02325&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02325&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02325
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02325&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02325&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02325&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A2325#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback