NY A02317 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.688
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.688
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the composition of the local advisory board for the Belmont racetrack facility.
Title
Relates to the composition of the local advisory board for the Belmont racetrack facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.688 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.658 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5481B |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2317b |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2317a |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.228 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S05481 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.688