NY A02317 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - RECOMMITTED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - RECOMMITTED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a health care plan from making prescription drug formulary changes during a contract year.
Title
Prohibits a health care plan from making prescription drug formulary changes during a contract year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO INSURANCE |
2018-04-30 | Senate | returned to senate |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2317c |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-04-17 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2018-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2317b |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.171 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 2317a |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.390 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S05022 (Same As) 2018-04-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5022C