NY A02316 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-23)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - signed chap.184
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-23)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - signed chap.184
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires facilities to perform pulse oximetry screening on newborns.
Title
Requires facilities to perform pulse oximetry screening on newborns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.184 |
2013-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-06-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1216 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S270B |
2013-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.385 |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | print number 2316b |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | print number 2316a |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00270 (Same As) 2013-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2316B