NY A02310 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires mandated reporters to receive coursework or training regarding the identification and reporting of child abuse and maltreatment every three years.
Title
Requires mandated reporters to receive coursework or training regarding the identification and reporting of child abuse and maltreatment every three years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.170 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.186 |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S01818 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION