NY A02300 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s3437c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s3437c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a dedicated telephone line for housing discrimination complaints.
Title
Establishes a dedicated telephone line for housing discrimination complaints.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s3437c |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.535 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | print number 2300c |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | print number 2300b |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | print number 2300a |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03437 (Same As) 2021-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.701