NY A02291 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - print number 2291a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - print number 2291a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing small business tax-deferred savings accounts.
Title
Relates to authorizing small business tax-deferred savings accounts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Assembly | print number 2291a |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S00022 (Same As) 2022-03-02 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE