NY A02285 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to personal phone calls for inmates in certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to personal phone calls for inmates in certain circumstances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-08Senate3RD READING CAL.25
2019-05-08SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1850
2019-02-11SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
2019-02-11Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-02-11Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.28
2019-01-28Assemblyreported
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to correction

Same As/Similar To

S01850 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2285

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback