NY A02271 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - print number 2271c
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - print number 2271c
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the gap elimination adjustment.
Title
Repeals the gap elimination adjustment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Assembly | print number 2271c |
2016-02-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | print number 2271b |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | print number 2271a |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2015-01-15 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S02743 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - PRINT NUMBER 2743C