NY A02266 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to criminal mischief in the third degree and criminal mischief in the second degree.
Title
Relates to criminal mischief in the third degree and criminal mischief in the second degree.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] | Asm. Diane Richardson [D] | Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] |
Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] | Asm. Alfred Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.102 |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.222 |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S02888 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CODES