NY A02266 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-06 - ordered to third reading cal.191
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "voting rights notification and registration act"; allows for voting participation by eligible voters with felony convictions by providing notice regarding voting rights, assistance with voter registration, and data sharing among the department of correctional services, the division of parole, and the state board of elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "voting rights notification and registration act"; allows for voting participation by eligible voters with felony convictions by providing notice regarding voting rights, assistance with voter registration, and data sharing among the department of correctional services, the division of parole, and the state board of elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 47 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-06 ordered to third reading cal.191
2010-01-06 RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-01-06 DIED IN SENATE
2009-06-18 REFERRED TO RULES
2009-06-17 delivered to senate
2009-06-17 passed assembly
2009-06-08 ordered to third reading rules cal.83
2009-06-08 rules report cal.83
2009-06-08 reported
2009-06-02 reported referred to rules
2009-05-26 print number 2266a
2009-05-26 amend and recommit to ways and means
2009-02-25 reported referred to ways and means
2009-01-15 referred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S1266-A (Same As) 2010-05-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback