NY A02261 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "private environmental law enforcement act"; authorizes any private citizen who has an interest which is or may be adversely affected to commence civil judicial actions for injunctive or declaratory relief to remedy environmental harms under certain circumstances; provides that such action may be commenced against any person for any violation of an administrative or court order compelling an investigation or remediation of an inactive hazardous waste disposal site.
Title
Enacts "private environmental law enforcement act"; authorizes any private citizen who has an interest which is or may be adversely affected to commence civil judicial actions for injunctive or declaratory relief to remedy environmental harms under certain circumstances; provides that such action may be commenced against any person for any violation of an administrative or court order compelling an investigation or remediation of an inactive hazardous waste disposal site.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.101 |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.201 |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05394 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION