NY A02257 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a commission to be known as the "New York seawall study commission" which will study the feasibility, costs, impacts, and best locations for construction of a seawall or sea gate being created to protect the city of New York from sea level rise and storm surge along the entire coastline.
Title
Establishes a commission to be known as the "New York seawall study commission" which will study the feasibility, costs, impacts, and best locations for construction of a seawall or sea gate being created to protect the city of New York from sea level rise and storm surge along the entire coastline.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.242 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1490 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3435A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.389 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | print number 2257a |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S03435 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - tabled