NY A02251 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-22 - print number 2251a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-22 - print number 2251a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and directs the committee on open government to study proactive disclosure as a means of increasing transparency and access to government information.
Title
Authorizes and directs the committee on open government to study proactive disclosure as a means of increasing transparency and access to government information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Assembly | print number 2251a |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2011-01-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00088 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES