NY A02242 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-22 - signed chap.241
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-22 - signed chap.241
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the scope of information disclosed in a published notice of change of name.
Title
Limits the scope of information disclosed in a published notice of change of name.
Sponsors
Asm. Harry Bronson [D] | Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-22 | Senate | signed chap.241 |
2015-09-15 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5240 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.13 |
2015-02-03 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-15 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05240 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2242