NY A02239 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - substituted by s1091a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - substituted by s1091a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a municipality to increase the number of years of service that a participant in a defined contribution plan or defined benefit plan service award program may receive a contribution for up to an additional ten years, to a maximum of fifty years; makes related provisions.
Title
Authorizes a municipality to increase the number of years of service that a participant in a defined contribution plan or defined benefit plan service award program may receive a contribution for up to an additional ten years, to a maximum of fifty years; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Assembly | substituted by s1091a |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.81 |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | print number 2239a |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S01091 (Same As) 2021-08-20 - SIGNED CHAP.400