NY A02230 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - substituted by s70
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - substituted by s70
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "hate crimes analysis and review act", specifying the collection and reporting of certain demographic data regarding the victims and alleged perpetrators of hate crimes.
Title
Enacts the "hate crimes analysis and review act", specifying the collection and reporting of certain demographic data regarding the victims and alleged perpetrators of hate crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Assembly | substituted by s70 |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.200 |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00070 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2230A