NY A02221 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the effectiveness of provisions of law relating to temporary retail permits issued by the state liquor authority; extends provisions from 2019 to 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the effectiveness of provisions of law relating to temporary retail permits issued by the state liquor authority; extends provisions from 2019 to 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-19Senate3RD READING CAL.273
2019-03-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4116
2019-02-26SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
2019-02-26Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-02-26Assemblypassed assembly
2019-02-07Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.41
2019-02-05Assemblyreported
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S04116 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2221

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback