NY A02206 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-20 - signed chap.483
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-20 - signed chap.483
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force to explore the effects of cyber-bullying in New York state and potential measures to address such effects.
Title
Establishes a task force to explore the effects of cyber-bullying in New York state and potential measures to address such effects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-20 | Assembly | signed chap.483 |
2021-10-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-26 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.192 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S623 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.294 |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00623 (Same As) 2021-05-26 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2206