NY A02199 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that where summary judgment is denied to a plaintiff, which denial is thereafter reversed on appeal and granted in favor of such plaintiff, any money judgment entered in favor of the plaintiff thereafter shall bear interest from the date of entry of the prior denial of such motion for summary judgment as if summary judgment had in fact been granted to such plaintiff in the first instance.
Title
Provides that where summary judgment is denied to a plaintiff, which denial is thereafter reversed on appeal and granted in favor of such plaintiff, any money judgment entered in favor of the plaintiff thereafter shall bear interest from the date of entry of the prior denial of such motion for summary judgment as if summary judgment had in fact been granted to such plaintiff in the first instance.
Sponsors
Asm. Catalina Cruz [D] | Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] |
Asm. Charles Lavine [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 116 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 116 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-29 | Assembly | tabled |
2021-12-29 | Assembly | vetoed memo.69 |
2021-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.524 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S473 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.221 |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00473 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2199