NY A02189 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - amended on third reading 2189a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - amended on third reading 2189a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to expediting actions involving insurance claims for damages resulting from a state disaster emergency.
Title
Relates to expediting actions involving insurance claims for damages resulting from a state disaster emergency.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Latrice Walker [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2189a |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.95 |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.167 |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |