NY A02177 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires degree-granting institutions of higher education to make certain biennial disclosures and to conspicuously publish the report on the website of such institution and submit the website address of such report to the department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires degree-granting institutions of higher education to make certain biennial disclosures and to conspicuously publish the report on the website of such institution and submit the website address of such report to the department.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.64
2023-06-05Assemblyamended on third reading 2177a
2023-03-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.27
2023-03-01Assemblyreported
2023-01-23Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S00529 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback