NY A02170 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - RECOMMITTED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - RECOMMITTED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes expedited partner therapy for certain sexually transmitted infections.
Title
Authorizes expedited partner therapy for certain sexually transmitted infections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO HEALTH |
2016-03-30 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2016-02-24 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2170b |
2016-02-24 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2016-02-24 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-02-24 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2016-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2016-02-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-02-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-20 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2170a |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.104 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.183 |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-15 | Assembly | referred to health |