NY A02157 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Hearing: May 30 @ 10:00 am in Room 630 LOB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that altered motor vehicles commonly referred to as "stretch limousines" which were altered on or after January 1, 2020, shall have at least two safety belts for the front seat and at least one safety belt for the rear seat for each passenger for which the rear seat of such vehicle was designed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that altered motor vehicles commonly referred to as "stretch limousines" which were altered on or after January 1, 2020, shall have at least two safety belts for the front seat and at least one safety belt for the rear seat for each passenger for which the rear seat of such vehicle was designed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-16Assemblyprint number 2157a
2019-05-16Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to transportation
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to transportation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback