NY A02132 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-31 - signed chap.236
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-31 - signed chap.236
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain payments to the horsemen's organization.
Title
Relates to certain payments to the horsemen's organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-31 | Senate | signed chap.236 |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-05-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1866 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.236 |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-15 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S01866 (Same As) 2015-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2132