NY A02122 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.705
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.705
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires gas and electric utilities to make available to landlords or lessors, upon request of prospective tenants or lessees, information concerning gas and electric charges incurred for residential rental premises; provides that such information shall be furnished without any charge or fee.
Title
Requires gas and electric utilities to make available to landlords or lessors, upon request of prospective tenants or lessees, information concerning gas and electric charges incurred for residential rental premises; provides that such information shall be furnished without any charge or fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.705 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-03-27 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-03-27 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-27 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.105 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | substituted for a2122 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | referred to energy |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.265 |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | substituted by s3585 |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.105 |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S03585 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.705