NY A02111 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - ordered to third reading cal.102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - ordered to third reading cal.102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the public service commission and the New York state energy research and development authority to ensure funds are available to fund programs assisting building owners with installing energy efficient improvements.
Title
Requires the public service commission and the New York state energy research and development authority to ensure funds are available to fund programs assisting building owners with installing energy efficient improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.102 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.67 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.67 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-02-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-15 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S03943 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS