NY A02107 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - advanced to third reading cal.495
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the collection of rent arrearages accruing prior to the date of approval of an application for an adjustment in the legal regulated rent based upon a major capital improvement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the collection of rent arrearages accruing prior to the date of approval of an application for an adjustment in the legal regulated rent based upon a major capital improvement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.495
2017-05-23Assemblyreported
2017-05-16Assemblyprint number 2107a
2017-05-16Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2017-05-16Assemblyreported referred to codes
2017-01-17Assemblyreferred to housing

Same As/Similar To

S05945 (Same As) 2017-05-08 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback