NY A02106 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-27 - SIGNED CHAP.125
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-27 - SIGNED CHAP.125
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the New York State Reuniting Families Act; relates to foster care and parents in immigration detention or removal proceedings.
Title
Enacts the New York State Reuniting Families Act; relates to foster care and parents in immigration detention or removal proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Children And Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Children And Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-27 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.125 |
2019-07-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-04 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.227 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | substituted for a2106a |
2019-05-22 | Senate | referred to children and families |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.629 |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5024A |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | substituted by s5024a |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2106a |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.227 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S05024 (Same As) 2019-07-27 - SIGNED CHAP.125