NY A02103 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - substituted by s8830
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - substituted by s8830
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various provisions regulating equitable siting of environmental facilities; requires environmental impact statements to state whether the siting of a facility will cause or increase a disproportionate burden on disadvantaged communities.
Title
Makes various provisions regulating equitable siting of environmental facilities; requires environmental impact statements to state whether the siting of a facility will cause or increase a disproportionate burden on disadvantaged communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Assembly | substituted by s8830 |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.81 |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-22 | Assembly | print number 2103d |
2022-04-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | print number 2103c |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | print number 2103b |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | print number 2103a |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |